judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1992
A-1992
12/20/1948
Application for Writ of Error
FRANK H. ABEL
MARSHALL A. MASON, SR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/12/1949Amended motion for rehearingPetitioner
02/02/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/04/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/30/1948Response to PetitionRespondent
12/20/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/05/1949Letter Filed
02/12/1949Amended motion for rehearingOverruled
02/02/1949Motion for Rehearing
02/01/1949Motion to Amend Filed
01/04/1949Reply to Response
12/30/1948Response to Petition
12/20/1948Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/20/1948Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Marshall A. Mason, Sr.Respondent
Frank H. AbelPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information