judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2091
A-2091
02/14/1949
Application for Writ of Error
WEST END RURAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT OF AUSTIN COUNTY, ET AL.
COLUMBUS CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF COLORADO COUNTY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/27/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/07/1949Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
02/23/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
02/14/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/1949Response to Motion filed
05/27/1949Motion for Rehearing
04/07/1949Brief on the Merits
03/09/1949Document received (See Remarks)
02/23/1949Response to Petition
02/14/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Columbus Consolidated Independent School District of Colorado County, et al.Respondent
West End Rural High School District of Austin County, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information