judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00627-CR
14-81-00627-CR
06/16/1981
Burglary
Ashley, Gerald
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/27/1982Waiver of remaining time to file briefState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/1983Mandate Issued
12/16/1983Record RETURNED from Higher Court
11/23/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
08/05/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
07/25/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
06/28/1983No description available.
06/09/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/02/1983Case ready to be set
12/01/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
11/17/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
11/12/1982No description available.
10/27/1982Waiver of remaining time to file brief
10/22/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
10/01/1982No description available.
02/23/1982Transcript FILED
06/16/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable SAMUEL ROBERTSON
332,474
5 yrs.