judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1915
A-1915
10/18/1948
Application for Writ of Error
ANDRES GARZA
M. C. CAVAZOS, NASARIA M. DE LONGORIA, WORTH ANDREWS, DON C. CAMERON AND H. J. KRUEGER, MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY, CARMEN C. GARZA AND MARIA C. GARZA, M. C. CAVAZOS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/15/1949Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
06/13/1949Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/10/1949Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
06/08/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/08/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/16/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/24/1949Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/16/1949Response to Brief filedPetitioner
02/11/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/26/1948Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/10/1948Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/27/1948Response to PetitionRespondent
10/18/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/15/1949Brief in Support of Petition
06/13/1949Supplemental Brief filed
06/10/1949Brief in Support of Petition
06/08/1949Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/08/1949Motion for Rehearing
03/16/1949Motion for Rehearing
03/02/1949Opinion issued
02/24/1949Supplemental Brief filed
02/16/1949Response to Brief filed
02/11/1949Brief on the Merits
01/19/1949Document received (See Remarks)
11/27/1948Letter Filed
11/26/1948Motion for RehearingFiling granted
11/10/1948Reply to Response
10/27/1948Response to Petition
10/18/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Magnolia Petroleum Company, Carmen C. Garza and Maria C. GarzaRespondent
M. C. Cavazos, Nasaria M. de Longoria, Worth Andrews, Don C. Cameron and H. J. KruegerRespondent
M. C. Cavazos, et al.Respondent
Andres GarzaPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information