judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-96-00869-CV
04-96-00869-CV
10/25/1996
Divorce
Hipolito Hermida
Florence A.B. Hermida
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/19/1998Mandate Issued
08/19/1998Mandate Issued
07/03/1998Information regarding cause received
07/03/1998Information regarding cause received
05/28/1998Information regarding cause received
05/26/1998Information regarding cause received
05/26/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
05/26/1998Continuation of Information from previous event
05/26/1998Information regarding cause received
05/01/1998Information regarding cause received
04/29/1998Information regarding cause received
04/27/1998Information regarding cause received
04/24/1998Information regarding cause received
02/23/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/12/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/28/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/28/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/19/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
07/07/1997Information regarding cause received
07/01/1997Motion f/l/file Post-Submission brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/01/1997Motion f/l/file Post-Submission brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/24/1997No Description Available.
06/24/1997Motion f/l/file Post-Submission brief filed
06/24/1997Post-Submission Brief Received
06/10/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
06/10/1997Motion f/l/file Amended Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/10/1997Submitted
06/10/1997Submission
06/10/1997Submitted
06/03/1997Amended Brief Filed
06/03/1997Amended Brief Received
06/03/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/03/1997Motion f/l/file Amended Brief Filed
06/02/1997Reply brief filed
05/09/1997Submission
04/03/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/03/1997Order Entered
04/01/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/25/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/25/1997Response to Motion Filed
03/24/1997Response to Motion Filed
03/21/1997No Description Available.
03/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/21/1997No Description Available.
03/13/1997Response to Motion Filed
03/13/1997No Description Available.
03/06/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
03/04/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/03/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/21/1997Requests Oral Argument
02/21/1997Brief Filed
02/21/1997Case ready to be set
02/21/1997Case ready to be set
02/20/1997No Description Available.
02/20/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/20/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/20/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/20/1997No Description Available.
02/20/1997No Description Available.
01/27/1997Brief Filed
01/27/1997Requests Oral Argument
01/27/1997Requests Oral Argument
12/17/1996Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/04/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
12/04/1996Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/26/1996Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
11/26/1996Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/22/1996Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/25/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/25/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/25/1996No Description Available.
10/25/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/25/1996No Description Available.
10/25/1996No Description Available.
10/25/1996No Description Available.
10/25/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/29/1996Appeal Bond Filed
07/26/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
07/01/1996Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/17/2004RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
08/19/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hipolito F. HermidaAppellantSharon E. Callaway
Darrell G. Lochte
Sunny J. Jansma
Florence A.b. HermidaAppelleeThomas S. Terrell
Trial Court Information
County Court
Kerr
91-640-C
n/a