judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00454-CR
02-96-00454-CR
10/21/1996
Other Felony
Rivera, Heriberto Eddie
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/18/1997Mandate Issued
07/03/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/13/1997Submitted
05/13/1997Submission
04/30/1997Letter
04/25/1997Letter
04/10/1997Submission
04/08/1997Brief Filed
04/08/1997Case ready to be set
02/07/1997Brief Filed
01/06/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/20/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/12/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
10/21/1996Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/18/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rivera, Heriberto EddieCriminal - AppellantPayton J. Hunt
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasCharles M. Mallin
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Don Leonard, Criminal District Court No. 3
0578930A
Ct2: 40 yrs IDTDCJ