judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-96-01256-CV
01-96-01256-CV
10/21/1996
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Rysavy, Lawrence
Squier, Hon. James D.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/04/1996Opinion issuedOverruled
11/04/1996Submitted
11/04/1996Opinion issuedOverruled
11/04/1996Submission
11/04/1996Submitted
10/30/1996Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/28/1996Order enteredGrant motion
10/23/1996Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/21/1996Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/25/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Squier, JamesRespondentPatrice McDonald
The Honorable James D. Squier
Barbara Runge
RYSAVY, LAWRENCERelatorJames W. Woltz
Shawn Casey
Trial Court Information
312th District Court
Harris