judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00459-CR
02-96-00459-CR
10/21/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Nichols, Cary Lynn
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/23/1998Mandate Issued
01/28/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
10/16/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
09/12/1997Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
09/10/1997Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review
08/14/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/23/1997Submitted
04/23/1997Submission
04/21/1997Letter
04/16/1997Letter
03/11/1997Case ready to be set
03/10/1997Brief Filed
02/13/1997Submission
02/06/1997Brief Filed
02/03/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/27/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/31/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/29/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/28/1996No Description Available.
10/28/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed
10/21/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/23/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nichols, Cary LynnCriminal - AppellantDavid Chapman
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasCharles M. Mallin
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable R. E. Thornton
0565998D
CT1: 20 yrsIDTDCJ&$7500 fn