judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-96-00350-CR
11-96-00350-CR
10/24/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Ramos, Frank Fuentes
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2014Letter received
01/10/2000Record checked in
11/05/1999Record checked out
12/31/1998Yearly opinion book
10/30/1998Mandate issued
10/07/1998Case returned from higher court
09/16/1998Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case disposedRefused
05/29/1998Case forwarded to higher court
05/06/1998Petition for Discretionary Review in Criminal case or Petition for Review in Civil Case
04/09/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/02/1998Exhibits filed
02/23/1998We send letter to lawyers, etc.
01/22/1998Submitted
01/22/1998Submission set in Eastland
11/17/1997Submission set in Eastland
09/16/1997Brief filed
09/16/1997Case ready to be set
08/21/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/13/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief
07/16/1997Brief filed
07/10/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief
05/01/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/29/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief
02/27/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/18/1997Mot. - Ext. to file brief
01/17/1997Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
10/24/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/23/1996Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ramos, Frank FuentesCriminal - AppellantMichael Fouts, District Attorney
State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJames Hicks, District Attorney
Kollin Shadle
Trial Court Information
350th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Jess Holloway, Retired Judge
3893-D
99 Years/$10,000 fine