judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00492-CR
02-96-00492-CR
10/28/1996
Other Felony
Richards, Michael R.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1998Mandate Issued
06/11/1998Opinion issuedDismissed
06/10/1998Submitted
06/10/1998Submission
02/20/1998Letter to Attorneys Regarding Panel Members
07/22/1997Brief Filed
07/22/1997Case ready to be set
06/06/1997Brief Filed
06/06/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/21/1997No Description Available.
03/21/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/20/1997No Description Available.
03/14/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/28/1997No Description Available.
01/08/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/07/1997No Description Available.
11/01/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/30/1996No Description Available.
10/28/1996No Description Available.
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richards, Michael R.Criminal - AppellantAbe Factor
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasTim Curry
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Wayne Francis Salvant
0575836D
20 yrs., IDTDCJ