judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5971
B-5971
04/28/1976
Application for Writ of Error
GULF STATES THEATRES OF TEXAS, INC.
PARK PLAZA TWIN THEATRES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/15/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/20/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
04/28/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/19/1976Response to Motion filed
07/15/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/01/1976Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
05/20/1976Response to Petition
05/10/1976Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
04/28/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/28/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gulf States Theatres of Texas, Inc.Petitioner
Park Plaza Twin Theatres, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information