judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-82-00017-CR
10-82-00017-CR
02/10/1982
Burglary of a Building
David Glenn Bray
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/25/1983Case stored
10/25/1983Mandate issued by this Court
07/22/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/08/1982Submitted
02/10/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/30/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
77th District Court
Limestone
6079-A
15 Years and 1 Day