Case: 05-21-00137-CV
05-21-00137-CV
03/03/2021
Damages
Scott Magids and Alexis Magids
Henry's Plano Private Club, Restaurants Unlimited Texas, Inc., and Restaurants Unlimited, Inc
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/14/2021 | Letter brief filed | Appellee |
| ||||
04/05/2021 | Letter brief filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/15/2021 | Response due regarding jurisdiction | | |||||
04/14/2021 | Letter brief filed |
| |||||
04/13/2021 | Record due | | |||||
04/08/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
04/05/2021 | Letter brief filed |
| |||||
04/05/2021 | Corrected document requested |
| |||||
04/05/2021 | Response due regarding jurisdiction | | |||||
03/26/2021 | Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect |
| |||||
03/09/2021 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
03/04/2021 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
03/04/2021 | Fee paid |
| |||||
03/03/2021 | Fee requested |
| |||||
03/03/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
03/03/2021 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
03/03/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
02/12/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/14/2021 | Status | Holding |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Henry's Plano Private Club, et al. | Appellee | William M. Toles |
Henry’s Plano Private Club, et al. | Appellee | Daniel Joseph Madden Adam T. Hamilton |
Scott Magids, et al. | Appellant | Matthew J. Kita Jonathan Derek Quick J. Gregory Marks |
Trial Court Information
296th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable John Roach
296-04410-2019
Janet L. Dugger