judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1997
A-1997
12/21/1948
Application for Writ of Error
CHESTER BURATTI AND HARRY E. MONTANDON, DBA BURATTI AND MONDANDON
ROY I. TENNANT AND WIFE, MRS. CLARA T. TENNANT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1949Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/14/1949Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/27/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/21/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/15/1949Supplemental Brief filed
02/14/1949Supplemental Brief filed
01/27/1949Brief on the Merits
01/12/1949Document received (See Remarks)
12/21/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/21/1948Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roy I. Tennant and Wife, Mrs. Clara T. TennantRespondent
Chester Buratti and Harry E. Montandon, dba Buratti and MondandonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information