judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-08725-CV
09-81-08725-CV
08/20/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Thornton, Mary et al
Fenelon Funeral Home
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/11/1985Mandate Issued
03/11/1985Case Returned from Higher Ct.
02/13/1985Writ DisposedRefused
12/20/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/20/1984Writ Filed
11/20/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/14/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/30/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/05/1984Submitted
07/11/1983Brief Filed
06/23/1983Submission
06/23/1983No Description Available.
06/15/1983Brief Filed
05/16/1983Statement of Facts Filed
08/20/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/11/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
172nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable David Walker
E106,547