judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD GORDON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1096
Short Caption:RICHARD GORDON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Lead: 89-CF-0944 Consolidated:89-CF-1096
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11784-88Filed Date:09/12/1989

Opening Event Date:09/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/12/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/27/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/16/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard Gordon N
Thomas M. Slawson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Robert A. Feitel YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GORDON, RICHARD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 89-944 NOTE - 01
09/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/02/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989ORDER SS, CONS 89-944 & 89-1096; THIMAS SLAWSON APPTD FOR APLT; APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD R
11/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 89-944 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (237 PGS. -- TREMEL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(22 PGS/FINNERIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CRT RPTR BURNEY TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE 6/5/89 - 6/7/89 PROC. TO MARCH 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF RPTR BURNEY FOR EXT TO FILE 6/5/89 - 6/7/89 RT RT DUE BY 3/30/90 (NFX) JB PANELRO SCDATE 021790 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(369 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 033090 SCHPRD RT
05/22/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 052290 SCHPRD BA
06/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-20-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 062690 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/20/90; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062290 SCHPRD B
07/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 072090 SCHPRD BE
02/27/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/27/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/16/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992RECEIVED SR'S 2-5 (PIRFO -- 109; 237 PGS. -- TREMEL; 369 PGS. -- BURNEY; 189 PGS. -- BURNEY) RG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD