judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARL E. HARRIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1060
Short Caption:CARL E. HARRIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4019-89Filed Date:08/18/1989

Opening Event Date:08/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/12/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/19/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/27/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarl E. Harris N
Idus J. Daniel YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David A. Payne YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARRIS, CARL E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902TO MMP FILED 2/19/92 APLT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
08/18/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (85 PGS/SCHOCH) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(172 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1990ORDER APPELLANT TO FILE DOCKETING STATEMENT W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED JB PANELRO SCDATE 082890 SCHPRD DSA
03/16/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD DSA
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (155-PGS/LEWIS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990RECORD COMPLETED
04/16/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-9-90. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 7/9/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 061290 SCHPRD B
07/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 15, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO ENLARGMENT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/15/90. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 072790 SCHPRD B
08/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 081590 SCHPRD BA
09/19/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092090 SCHPRD BE
09/19/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/14/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/16/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1991RECEIVED LTR FROM APLT RE OBTAINING A COPY OF THE OPINION OR JMT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1991LETTER FROM CHIEF DEPUTY TO APLT RE DISPOSITION OF CASE, FORWARD- ING COPY OF MOJ. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1992MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RULE 35 REQUEST FOR MOD. OF SENT. TIME EXPIRED PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1992RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION RE INEFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1992grant appellant's unopposed motion for enlargement of time to file Rule 35 request for modification of sentence time having expired, appellant's pro se proceeding, and is appearing that the motions are construed as a motion to recall mandate and reissue mandate, it is ORDERED that the mandates' issued on April 16, 1991, is hereby recalled and the Clerk of the Superior Court is directed to transmitsame to the Clerk of this court forthwith.
07/27/1992ORDER Judgment on appeal be and hereby is affirmed; f/o Clerk to issue mandate forthwith. (By FA, ST, MK)
07/27/1992MANDATE ISSUED