judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY C. CLEMONS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1037
Short Caption:LARRY C. CLEMONS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5527-82Filed Date:08/05/1988

Opening Event Date:08/05/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/25/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry C. Clemons N
Diane K. Dildine NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CLEMONS, LARRY C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/14/88 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO STAY W/OUT PREJ TO RENEWAL NOTE - 02 IN EVENT TRL CRT INDICATES ITS NOTE - 02 WILLINGNESS TO GRANT RELIEF NOTE - 03 REQUESTED-SEE SMITH V. POLLIN. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 4/19/89 ORD: DENY APLT'S MO. NOTE - 04 TO WITHDRAW APPEAL W/O PREJ. NOTE - 05 TO RENEWAL PROVIDED APLT, W/I NOTE - 05 10 DAYS FM DATE OF THIS ORDER, NOTE - 06 SUBMITS A STMT IN ACCORDANCE NOTE - 06 WITH JOHNSON V. U.S.
08/05/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/25/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DIANE K. DILDINE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD DSA
11/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 100488 SCHPRD R
11/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL & REMAND CASE TO TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD BA
12/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-17-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD Q
01/09/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/17/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 122088 SCHPRD OPE
02/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-30-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD BA
02/21/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD X
03/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(EXHIBITION #1 & 2)(ORDERS DATED 11/10/87 & 6/28/88 SALZMAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD BA
04/19/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 6 SL PANELRO SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD N
05/01/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING MOTION TO WITHDRAW (AFFIDAVIT) JB PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD STATE
05/04/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/04/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 050289 SCHPRD M
05/04/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/25/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD