judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SPACE QUALIFIED SYSTEMS CORP. RINEY, ROSE

Case Information: 86-CV-0463
Short Caption:SPACE QUALIFIED SYSTEMS CORP. RINEY, ROSEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA11908-84Filed Date:03/07/1986

Opening Event Date:03/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/30/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/16/1986
Argued/Submitted:04/03/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Leroy M. FykesYN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Charlene A. Walker NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
B. Milile Archibald YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SPACE QUALIFIED SYSTEMS CORP. RINEY, ROSE ESTATE OF:
03/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/30/1986FiledRecord Completed
12/16/1986FiledBriefing Completed
04/03/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/07/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition