judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JIMMY J. VAUGHN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0679
Short Caption:JIMMY J. VAUGHN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3720-83Filed Date:05/27/1988

Opening Event Date:05/27/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/05/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJimmy J. Vaughn N
Thomas G. Ross YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Joyce J. Bang YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901VAUGHN, JIMMY J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 12/9/88 ORD GRT APLT MO FO EXT NOTE - 01 OF TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO THE NOTE - 02 EXTENT THAT BRF TO BE FL IN 10 NOTE - 02 DAYS OR COUNSEL APMT VACATED NOTE - 03 AND THIS MATTER REFERRED TO NOTE - 03 BPR.
05/27/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS G. ROSS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS TO JULY 6TH JB PANEL SCDATE 062788 SCHPRD DSA
07/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/05/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 072688 SCHPRD R
08/09/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/28/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD BA
11/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 14, 1988 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-28-88 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-19-88 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 1-3 PB PANELRO SCDATE 100488 SCHPRD V
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
01/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/22/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD BE
02/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-9-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/22/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD M
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 3/9/89 - NFX. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 022289 SCHPRD BE
03/09/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 030989 SCHPRD BE
07/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD