judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANIEL L. PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0632
Short Caption:DANIEL L. PHILLIPS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:88-CF-0632Consolidated: 88-CF-0724
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9891-87Filed Date:05/16/1988

Opening Event Date:05/16/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/19/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/09/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaniel L. Phillips N
Stephen D. ScavuzzoNN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Marilyn Newhouse YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia L. Petty YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PHILLIPS, DANIEL L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/10/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF STEPHEN SCAVUZZO & APPT NOTE - 02 MARILYN NEWHOUSE FOR APLT; BRF NOTE - 03 OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 03 COMPLETE RECORD IS FL. NOTE - 04 CO-DEFT - ALBERT A. JONES NOTE - 04 #88-724 NOTE - 05 CON 88-724 NOTE - 05
01/01/1906 SCAVUZZOS VACATED 1/10/89.
05/16/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEPHEN D. SCAVUZZO, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD DSA
07/19/1988RECORD ON APPEAL MLH PANEL SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD R
10/19/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1980 PGS/CARTER) AD PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD RT
12/19/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARILYN NEWHOUSE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD CHECK
05/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (130 PGS RT-GRAYBILL) MLR PANEL SCDATE 043089 SCHPRD RT
06/02/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071289 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1989ORDER SS, CONS 88-632 & 88-724;BRF OF APLT IN 88-724 DUE IN 10 & BRF OF APLE DUE 30 THEREAFTR. PANELRO SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD X
08/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT IN 88-724 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/10/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 13TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE IN 88-724 JB PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD BA
08/18/1989RECEIVED IN 88-724 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 88-724 DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT BA IN 88-724 IS FL; GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/13/89.DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD X
10/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF APPELLANT'S CONVICTION PANELTESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/09/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD