judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE E. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1191
Short Caption:GEORGE E. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12564-88Filed Date:10/06/1989

Opening Event Date:10/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/09/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/30/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge E. Brown N
Kenneth H. RosenauYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Roy W. McLeese, IIIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, GEORGE E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/30 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ROSENAUK FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BROWNRI FOR - APPELLEE
10/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) KENNETH H. ROSENAU, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/07/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD DSA
12/27/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (3 PGS/V. BREMEN) AD PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD R
02/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (34 PGS. -- RAMOS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032490 SCHPRD RT
02/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(112 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 032590 SCHPRD RT
03/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(119 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 032690 SCHPRD RT
04/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (8-PGS/FARMER) JT PANEL SCDATE 032790 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1990APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRF/MEMO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1990RECEIVED SUPP. MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-20-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990ORDER GRANTG MO FOR LV TO FILE SUPP MEMO; CLK TO FILE AS A SUPP BRIEF; APLE'S BRF DUE IN 30.CC PANELBE SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD TO
08/16/1990APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ONE DAY EXTENSION TO 9/18 RJG PANEL SCDATE 091790 SCHPRD BE
09/18/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD V
01/17/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE FOR LEAVE TO PERMIT STUDENT COUNSEL TO ARG APPEAL FOR U.S. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1991RECEIVED APPROVAL OF USA FOR STUDENT COUNSEL TO ARGUE APPEAL FOR U.S. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1991ORDER GRANT MOT TO PERMIT STUDENT COUNSEL, RICHARD T. BROWN TO ARGUE ON 1/30/91. MEH PANELSTWAMK SCDATE 011891 SCHPRD VS
01/30/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/30/1991ARGUED PANELSTWGMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JMT ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 013091 SCHPRD RDEC
03/29/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/19/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD