judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MANDOUHI, ALA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 86-CT-1558
Short Caption:MANDOUHI, ALA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:T1206-86Filed Date:11/13/1986

Opening Event Date:11/13/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/22/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/10/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/16/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAla Mandouhi NPro SeN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Lois R. GoodmanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MANDOUHI, ALA DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 031187 ORD: GRANT MO FOR FORMA NOTE - 01 PAUPERIS & CLERK OF SUPR CRT NOTE - 02 TO TRANSMIT RECORD W/O FEE NOTE - 02 FORTHWITH; GRANT APLT REQUEST NOTE - 03 FOR APPTMNT OF COUNSEL & APPT NOTE - 03 LOIS R. GOODMAN TO REPRESENT NOTE - 04 APLT; APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FL NOTE - 04 STATEMENT INDICATING WHETHER NOTE - 05 RT WILL BE ORDERED FOR THIS NOTE - 05 APPEAL.
11/13/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/05/1987LETTER REQUESTING APLT TO FILE FORM 5 AFF & MOTION TO APPT COUNSEL W/I 15 DAYS KK PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE PRO SE, & AFFIDAVIT (FORM 5) MLH PANEL SCDATE 020587 SCHPRD ANS
02/20/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 040187 SCHPRD R
03/11/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LOIS R. GOODMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/11/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011287 SCHPRD R
05/22/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/22/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/01/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT MLH PANEL SCDATE 070187 SCHPRD BA
08/10/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD OPE
11/20/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (43 PGS - HAWKINS) PB PANEL SCDATE 091587 SCHPRD RT
01/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ADDITIONAL 40 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 123087 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012288 SCHPRD N
03/30/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 1O DAYS TO FILE BRIEF OR VACATE APPOINT- MENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 022988 SCHPRD BA
04/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 041188 SCHPRD BA
04/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELPY SCDATE 042888 SCHPRD V
05/10/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/10/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 060288 SCHPRD BE
11/16/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/16/1988SUBMITTED PANELNWBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD