judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELTON R. MARSHALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0411
Short Caption:ELTON R. MARSHALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9059-86Filed Date:04/09/1987

Opening Event Date:04/09/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/28/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/18/1988
Argued/Submitted:10/18/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/29/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElton R. Marshall N
Michael L. SpekterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William M. Blier YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MARSHALL, ELTON R. UNITED STATES
04/09/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD R
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL L. SPEKTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD CHECK
06/16/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
12/28/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/28/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (308 PGS - RONAN) JB PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
12/29/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/8/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD BA
03/08/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 030888 SCHPRD BA
04/05/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/6/88 (NO OPA) MLH (PB) PANEL SCDATE 040788 SCHPRD BE
04/18/1988FiledBriefing Completed
04/18/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 050688 SCHPRD BE
07/26/1988ORDER SS, SCHED CASE ON SUM CAL OF 10/18/88 AT 9:30 A.M. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 041888 SCHPRD READY
10/18/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/18/1988SUBMITTED PANELFETERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/29/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD