judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDWARD R. ROBINSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0433
Short Caption:EDWARD R. ROBINSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8437-86Filed Date:04/08/1987

Opening Event Date:04/08/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/08/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/01/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdward R. Robinson N
Anita Isicson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Julieanne Himelstein YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROBINSON, EDWARD R. UNITED STATES
04/08/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/04/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD R
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 062587 SCHPRD CHECK
06/18/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
05/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (116 PGS - BURNEY) JB PANEL SCDATE 042988 SCHPRD RT
05/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
05/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (117 PGS - WRAY) GT PANEL SCDATE 030988 SCHPRD RT
06/09/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BA
07/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 10, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD BE
08/10/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/8/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 081088 SCHPRD BE
08/17/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/8/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081288 SCHPRD X
09/08/1988FiledBriefing Completed
09/08/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 090888 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/01/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/23/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD