judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MOKHIBER, RUSSELL DAVIS, LEONARD

Case Information: 86-CV-0089
Short Caption:MOKHIBER, RUSSELL DAVIS, LEONARDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4367-78Filed Date:12/24/1985

Opening Event Date:12/24/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/09/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/30/1986
Argued/Submitted:12/09/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/27/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Cornish F. HitchcockYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Philip J. Hirschkop NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Salvatore A. Romano YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Ronald W. Meister YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MOKHIBER, RUSSELL DAVIS, LEONARD ET AL
01/01/1904JUDGE - BE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 86/12/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HITCHCOCKC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ROMANOS FOR - AARP ATTY 3 - SLADEJ FOR - APPELLEES
01/01/1906 HITCHCOCKC for: Russell Mokhiber HIRSCHKOPP HARRIET MILLER ROMANOS AMER. ASSOC OF RETIRED PERSON SLADEJ PRO HAC VICE (Davis, et al) MEISTERR COLONIAL PENN GROUP, INC.
12/24/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/08/1986RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GG PANEL SCDATE 010886 SCHPRD PDDA
01/31/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1986MEMORANDUM NO 7A...DESIGNATION/STATEMENT/ DUE MARCH 21st PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1986ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE DIS- MISSED. (NO DR/SRT) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 032186 SCHPRD DR
03/27/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER GG PANEL SCDATE 040486 SCHPRD ANSA
03/28/1986COUNTER DESIGNATION OF RECORD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1986ORDER APLT SHALL CAUSE RECORD TO BE PREPARED & TRANSMITTED FORTHWITH SL PANELPY SCDATE 040886 SCHPRD CHECK
05/09/1986FiledRecord Completed
05/09/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBITS: 5 LARGE BROWN ENVELOPE)(NO RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 051286 SCHPRD R
06/16/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/25/86 (NO OPPO) GG TTC PANEL SCDATE 061886 SCHPRD BA
06/26/1986APPELLANT'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 062586 SCHPRD BA
07/30/1986FiledBriefing Completed
07/30/1986APPELEE'S BRIEF (ASSOCIATION PARTIES) JB PANEL SCDATE 073086 SCHPRD BE
07/30/1986APPELEE'S BRIEF (COLONIAL PENN GROUP, INC.) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1986APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1986LETTER OF APPELLANT TO DRAW COURTS ATTENTION TO RECENT DECISION PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1986RECEIVED APPELLEE'S CITATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/09/1986ARGUED PANELPYFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLES TO ADMIT JEFFREY C. SLADE, ESQ., TO APPEAR FOR ARG PRO HAC VICE. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1986ORDER GRANT MO TO OF APLE TO ENTER APP OF JEFFREY SLADE, ESQ, PRO HAC VICE FOR ORAL ARG. EBP PANELPYFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1987LETTER OF APLT INFORMING THE COURT OF RECENT RELEVANT DECISION PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1987LETTER OF APPELLANT ADVISING COURT OF RECENT DECISION PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1987LETTER FROM APPELLEE, COLONIAL PENN GROUP, INC, RE RULE 28(K) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDGMENT AF/RV IN PART...CAUSE REMANDED FOR FURTHER PRCDGS PANELPYFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 537 A.2d 1100
02/17/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0237 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 0000 (CC/DS IN PART)
03/02/1988PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC (APPELLANT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1988ORDER APLES W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PET FOR REH/ REH EN BANC (10 COPIES) SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1988APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE (COLONIAL PENN, ETC) TO PETI- TION FOR REHEARING & REHEARING EN BANC MLH PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD ANSE
03/28/1988APPELLEE'S REPLY TO APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 032888 SCHPRD RPE
05/27/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988LETTER SENT TO APPEALS COORDINATOR & ATTORNEYS RETURNING EXHIBITS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD