judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WRECKING CORPORATION OF INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH

Case Information: 86-CV-0018
Short Caption:WRECKING CORPORATION OF INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTHClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA14859-82Filed Date:11/26/1985

Opening Event Date:11/26/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/17/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/11/1986
Argued/Submitted:12/16/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Louis Fireison NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Daniel J. Blum YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Frank J. Martell YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WRECKING CORPORATION OF AMERICA, VIRGINIA, INC. INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, ET AL
01/01/1906 MARTELLF for: I.C.N.A.
11/26/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/17/1986FiledRecord Completed
08/11/1986FiledBriefing Completed
12/16/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/05/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition