judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CRESTA, RICHARD THE NEUROLOGY CENTER P.A.

Case Information: 86-CV-0016
Short Caption:CRESTA, RICHARD THE NEUROLOGY CENTER P.A.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA14916-83Filed Date:11/27/1985

Opening Event Date:11/27/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/15/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/26/1987
Argued/Submitted:02/02/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles E. Channing NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James P. Salmon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CRESTA, RICHARD ET AL THE NEUROLOGY CENTER P.A. ET AL
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 012786 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 01 FOR EXT TO FILE CAS; CLK NOTE - 02 TO FILE CAS; NO 7A; APLT W/IN NOTE - 02 10 DAYS TO FILE DR & SRT W/CLK NOTE - 03 OF SUP CT & SERVE COPIES. NOTE - 03
01/01/1904JUDGE - ST AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/02/02 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - JIENNE FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - SALMONJ FOR - APPELLEES
11/27/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/12/1985RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1986MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT TO DECEMBER 27TH JB PANEL SCDATE 121285 SCHPRD CAS
01/09/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122485 SCHPRD OPE
02/10/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND SRT GG PANEL SCDATE 020586 SCHPRD DR
07/24/1986ORDER APLT TO TAKE STEPS TO CAUSE REC TO BE PREPARED & TRNSMTD TO THIS CT FORTHWITH. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041086 SCHPRD R
07/29/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 082586 SCHPRD R
07/29/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (DEPOSITIONS, 1 BROWN FOLDER OF EXHIBITS) VOLUMES 1 & 2) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1986FiledRecord Completed
10/15/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (41 PGS BURNS - 38 PGS SANBORN) JB PANEL SCDATE 082886 SCHPRD RT
11/14/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 15TH JB TTC PANEL SCDATE 112486 SCHPRD BA
12/12/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 22ND (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 121586 SCHPRD BA
12/17/1986ORDER GRANT MO; APLT'S BRIEF DUE 12/22/86; NFX TTC PANELPY SCDATE 122286 SCHPRD CHECK
12/22/1986APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 122286 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF WITH APPENDIX TO 2/11/87 (NO OPPO) GG TTC PANEL SCDATE 012687 SCHPRD BE
02/17/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 17TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 021187 SCHPRD BE
02/20/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1987FiledBriefing Completed
02/26/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1987ORDER GRANT MO CLK IS DIR TO FILE LDGD APLES' BR; AND THIS CASE SHALL BE CALENDARED ASAP. TC PANELPY SCDATE 022087 SCHPRD CHECK
02/02/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/02/1988ARGUED PANELMKFERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989REVERSED JDGMT RV JDGMT APPEALED FROM PANELRGMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RV METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 557 A.2d 156
04/12/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0624
05/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD