judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES E. STANTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0174
Short Caption:CHARLES E. STANTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4037-80Filed Date:02/11/1987

Opening Event Date:02/11/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/15/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/16/1987
Argued/Submitted:02/11/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/10/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles E. Stanton N
Frederick A. DouglasYY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Natalie O. LudawayNN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Julieanne Himelstein YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STANTON, CHARLES E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/10/88 ORD: DENY MOTION OF NOTE - 01 NICHOLAS S. PENN, ESQ., TO NOTE - 02 ASSIGN CO-CNSL AND DESIGNATE NOTE - 02 CNSL FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AS MOOT NOTE - 03 AND GRT MO. OF NATALIE O. NOTE - 03 LUDAWAY, ESQ., TO APPEAR AS NOTE - 04 CO-CNSL ON BEHALF OF APLT FOR NOTE - 04 THE PURPOSE OF ORAL ARGUMENT.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/02/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LUDAWAYN FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 LUDAWAYN CO-COUNSEL FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
02/11/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/24/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 022387 SCHPRD CHECK
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) FREDERICK A. DOUGLAS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (23 PGS - RHOADES) GG PANEL SCDATE 041387 SCHPRD R
04/15/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/22/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 29TH JB TTC PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD BA
06/29/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 3, 1987 RJG PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF; CLK TO FL LODGED BRF; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD OPE
08/11/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/16/87 (NO OPPO) GG PANEL SCDATE 081787 SCHPRD BE
09/16/1987FiledBriefing Completed
09/16/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 091687 SCHPRD BE
01/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/06/1988LETTER LETTER GRANTING REQ FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 2/11/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD OPE
02/03/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ASSIGN CO- COUNSEL & DESIGNATED COUNSEL FOR ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO ASSIGN CO- COUNSEL FOR ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 DAS PANELPYBERO SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD OPE
02/11/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/11/1988ARGUED PANELPYBERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER ON APPEAL PANELPYBERG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/10/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD