judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC D. CHASE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0570
Short Caption:ERIC D. CHASE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6377-86Filed Date:04/30/1987

Opening Event Date:04/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/05/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric D. Chase N
Donald W. Wisenor NN
AppellantEric D. Chase N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Oliver W. McDanielYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CHASE, ERIC D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 072087 ORDER: APLT DOCKETING NOTE - 01 STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS; COUNSL NOTE - 02 FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE NOTE - 02 STATE INDICATING WHETHER RT NOTE - 03 WILL BE ORDERED & PREPARED FOR NOTE - 03 THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 04 030288 ORDER: VACATING THE NOTE - 04 APPOINTMENT OF DONALD WISENOR, NOTE - 05 ESQ., & REFERRING THE MATTER NOTE - 05 TO THE BPR; FO: APPOINTING NOTE - 06 MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ., AS NOTE - 06 COUNSEL TO REPRESENT APLT ON NOTE - 07 APPEAL; DONALD WISENOR, ESQ., NOTE - 07 TO TRANSMIT RECORD & RT TO NOTE - 08 NEWLY APPOINTED COUNSEL FORTH- NOTE - 08 WITH; FO: NEWLY APPOINTED NOTE - 09 COUNSEL IN 20 DAYS TO FILE A NOTE - 09 STATE INDICATING WHETHER ADD NOTE - 10 RT WILL BE ORDERED FOR THIS NOTE - 10 APPEAL.
01/01/1906 WISENORD VACATED 3/2/88 & REFER TO BPR
04/30/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/24/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD R
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONALD WISENOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 063087 SCHPRD CHECK
07/20/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELMK SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD DSA
08/28/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF RT. EBP PANELBE SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD STATE
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (187 PGS - RONAN) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110187 SCHPRD RT
02/10/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR VACATE APPOINTMENT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
03/02/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 10. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
03/22/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT IN RESPONSE TO MARCH 2ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 032288 SCHPRD STATE
03/30/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD M
05/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 8TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD BA
05/23/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 6/8/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD V
06/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 15, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 060888 SCHPRD BA
06/15/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD OPE
07/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/18/88 MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BE
08/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/15/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 081888 SCHPRD BE
09/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/05/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/21/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD