judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE MITCHELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1373
Short Caption:JOSE MITCHELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14214-88Filed Date:11/15/1989

Opening Event Date:11/15/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/01/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/05/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/11/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/09/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose Mitchell N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJose Mitchell N
Richard S. Greenlee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Linda Otani Mckinney YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MITCHELL, JOSE UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1905TRDATE- 92/03/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GREENLEER FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MCKINNEYL FOR - APPELLEE
11/15/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/07/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD DSA
02/23/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) WITH ONE LARGE BROWN ACCORDIAN ENVELOPE OF EXHIBITS RJG PANEL SCDATE 011590 SCHPRD R
03/06/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR CALHOUN CERTIFICATION OF 8/23/89 PROCEEDING (CASE NOT ON CALENDAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(19 PGS/TREMEL) AD PANEL SCDATE 032390 SCHPRD RT
04/19/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR WRAY CERTIFICATION OF 10/18/89 PROC. (NOT W/JUDGE THIS DATE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 052990 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (250 PGS. -- MOORE) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(179 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(20 PGS/WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING TRANS- CRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO STAY BRFING SCHD, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD U
10/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(506 PGS/CALHOUN) AD PANEL SCDATE 100390 SCHPRD RT
10/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(285 PGS/CALHOUN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1990STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (82 PGS. -- MOORE) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011491 SCHPRD RT
02/01/1991RECORD COMPLETED
03/11/1991ORDER APLT BRF TO BE FLD 5-30-91 & APLE BRF TO BE FLD 7-5-91. NX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD GR
05/31/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1991RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1991ORDER APLT MO LV FL LODGED BA GRNTD & LODGED BRF FLD. GR PANELJAC SCDATE 060391 SCHPRD TO
07/05/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 070591 SCHPRD BE
07/05/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/11/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/11/1992ARGUED PANELRGSCKG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1992AFFIRMED Judgment AF judgment of conviction (RG SC KG)
06/09/1992MANDATE ISSUED