judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES E. TOLSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0579
Short Caption:JAMES E. TOLSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3798-86Filed Date:05/06/1987

Opening Event Date:05/06/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/02/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/05/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/06/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames E. Tolson N
Richard S. StolkerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Schornstein YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TOLSON, JAMES E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/07/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STOLKERR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SCHORNSTEINS FOR - APPELLEE
05/06/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD R
07/21/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD CHECK
08/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS OUT OF TIME JB PANEL SCDATE 080387 SCHPRD DSA
08/14/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9 PGS - RONAN) JB PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD RT
09/02/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/02/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED MLH (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (ORD JUDGE KING - DATED 8/31/87) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (1070 PGS. -- WATKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 061888 SCHPRD RT
07/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 30, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (PB) PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD BA
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME GT PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD BA
10/17/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110288 SCHPRD V
11/21/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 5, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 120488 SCHPRD BE
12/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (7 PGS RT - SIMMS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 010589 SCHPRD BE
01/09/1989APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT GOVT EXHIBIT 5 AS SUPP REC.DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD Q
02/22/1989APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD WITH APPELLANT'S TRANSCRIBED STATEMENT AND AUDIO TAPE (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S TRANSCRIBED STATE- MENT & AUDIO TAPE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO SUPP REC & CLK TO FL GOV'T EXHIBIT 5 (CASSETTE TAPE) AS SUPP REC. PANELRO SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD SR
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD GOV'T EXHIBIT 5 -CASSETTE TAPE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/06/1989ARGUED PANELMKTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1990LETTER TO APPEALS COOR. RETURNING EXHIBITS (ENVELOPE CONTAINING TAPE(CASSETTE) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD