judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM O. HUGHES, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0497
Short Caption:WILLIAM O. HUGHES, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5725-82Filed Date:04/27/1987

Opening Event Date:04/27/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/17/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam O. Hughes, Jr.N
Peter N. MannYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUGHES JR., WILLIAM O. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/23/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; NOTE - 02 PETER N. MANN APPT'S TO REPSNT NOTE - 02 APLT ON APPEAL; NEWLY APPT'D NOTE - 03 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL A STATE NOTE - 03 IN 20 DAYS INDICATING WHETHER NOTE - 04 RT WILL BE ORDERED & PREPARED. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 120387 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 05 IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APPROPRIATE NOTE - 06 MO FOR PRODUCTION OF RT IN THE NOTE - 06 SUP CT & SERVE COPY THEREOF W/ NOTE - 07 THIS CT & APLE. NOTE - 07
04/27/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/24/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062687 SCHPRD R
06/25/1987LETTER TO APLT RE: APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL & AFFIDAVIT (FORM 5) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (APPELLANT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL JB PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD ANSA
07/23/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER N. MANN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 071687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/23/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD CHECK
08/20/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS LATE JB PANEL SCDATE 082187 SCHPRD CHECK
09/25/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1987ORDER GRANT MO FOR LV TO FL DSA & CLK TO FL LODGED DSA; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 092087 SCHPRD OPE
11/04/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 30 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT. PB PANEL SCDATE 110687 SCHPRD BA
12/03/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 - 07. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD EBP
12/09/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 12/2/87 ORDER (MOTION FOR TRANSCRIPT FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT) PB PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD ANSA
12/11/1987LETTER LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE: STATUS OF APPEAL. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122787 SCHPRD CHECK
01/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/26/1988ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. CWC PANELMKRO SCDATE 020188 SCHPRD RT
10/26/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
11/17/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER OF APPELLANT PRO SE RE: ATTORNEY RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990RECEIVED LETTER FROM APLT (PRO SE) TO ATTORNEY REGARDING THIS CASE. GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD