judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH A. FRAZIER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0511
Short Caption:KENNETH A. FRAZIER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5390-83Filed Date:04/29/1987

Opening Event Date:04/29/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/24/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/01/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/27/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth A. Frazier N
Roger C. Wesley YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Edith S. Marshall YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FRAZIER, KENNETH A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 082587 ORDER: DENY APLT MO FOR NOTE - 01 PREPARATION OF RT W/OUT NOTE - 02 PREJUDICE TO ITS RENEWAL BEFOR NOTE - 02 THE TR CT FOR ITS CONSIDERATN NOTE - 03 IN THE FIRST INSTANCE; FO: NOTE - 03 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE AFORE NOTE - 04 SAID MO IN THE TR CT & SERVE A NOTE - 04 COPY W/THIS COURT W/IN 10 DAYS
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/07/01 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DENNISM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MARSHALLE FOR - APPELLEE
04/29/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROGER C. WESLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 061287 SCHPRD CHECK
07/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/01/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD R
07/06/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 071087 SCHPRD DSA
07/10/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PREPARATION OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072187 SCHPRD OPE
08/27/1987APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S 8/24/87 ORDER COPY OF PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT PB PANEL SCDATE 090487 SCHPRD ANS
09/04/1987RECEIVED SUP CT ORDER DATED 9/3/87 - DENYING APLT MO FOR PRODUCTION OF RT. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1987ORDER DENY MO OF APLT FOR PREPARA- TION OF RT. DAS PANELFEST SCDATE 092287 SCHPRD OPE
12/16/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD CHECK
01/21/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF & APPENDIX PB PANEL SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD BA
02/19/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 24, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 022588 SCHPRD BE
03/24/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/24/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032488 SCHPRD BE
06/21/1988ORDER GRANT LATE REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/1/88 DAS PANELPY SCDATE 061488 SCHPRD VS
06/28/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO APPOINT M.J. DENNIS AS CO-COUNSEL AND TO ARGUE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO TO ALLOW MICHAEL J. DENNIS ARG ON BEHALF OF APLT. DAS PANELFEROST SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD OPE
07/01/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/01/1988ARGUED PANELFERGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFERGST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/27/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD