judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAROLINE HAMLIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1235
Short Caption:CAROLINE HAMLIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11914-88Filed Date:10/10/1989

Opening Event Date:10/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/16/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/06/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/09/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Kenneth A. Vance NN
AppellantCaroline Hamlin N
Monoranjan Bezboruah YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
M. Kathleen O'Connor YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAMLIN, CAROLINE a/k/a CAROL PHILLIPS UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 04/24/90 ORD: GRANT APLE'S MO NOTE - 01 TO CONSOL NOS. 89-1264 & NOTE - 02 89-1235; APLT'S BRIEF IN NO. NOTE - 02 89-1235 DUE IN 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 03 THE COMPLETE RECORD HAS BEEN NOTE - 03 FILED. NOTE - 04 CON. 89-1264 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 071690 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNS NOTE - 05 FOR APLT IN NO. 89-1235 TO NOTE - 06 WITHDRAW APPEAL & THE APPNTMT NOTE - 06 OF KENNETH A. VANCE, ESQ, IS NOTE - 07 IS VACATED, & MONORANJAN NOTE - 07 BEZBORUAH,ESQ, IS APPOINTED TO NOTE - 08 REPRESENT APLT IN NO 89-1235; NOTE - 08 F/O THAT BRF OF APLT IN NO. NOTE - 09 89-1235 TO BE FILED W/IN 40 NOTE - 09 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/03/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PUIG-LUGOH FOR - APLT GLENN ATTY 2 - BEZBORUAHM FOR - APLT CAROLINE ATTY 3 - OCONNORK FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 VANCEK VACATED 07/16/90
10/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) KENNETH A. VANCE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
01/09/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD R
03/21/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE W/89-1264 AND TO REVISE BE IN 89-1264 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3 GW PANELRO SCDATE 041790 SCHPRD V
06/13/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/16/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MONORANJAN BEZBORUAH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 THUR 09 GW PANELRO SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD BA
08/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF SEPTEMBER 4TH AJ PANEL SCDATE 082790 SCHPRD BA
09/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/09/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD GR
10/10/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110890 SCHPRD BE
10/15/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO WITH DRAW ARG I OF THE APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO IN NO. 89-1235 LV TO W/D ARGUMENT 1 OF HER BRF. GW PANELRO SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD TO
02/05/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1991LETTER GRANT APLT'S 2/5/91 REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT CT PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/06/1991ARGUED PANELRGFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFNKE SCDATE 030691 SCHPRD RDEC
03/18/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/09/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD