judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARL A. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1219
Short Caption:CARL A. THOMPSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6916-88Filed Date:10/12/1989

Opening Event Date:10/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/21/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/07/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/30/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCarl A. Thompson N
James W. Richmond, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Albert A. Herring YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMPSON, CARL A. UNITED STATES
10/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JAMES W. RICHMOND, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD DSA
01/26/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD R
02/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (61-PGS/TANNER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 040790 SCHPRD RT
06/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
06/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (84 PGS. HAWKINS) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/14/1990ORDER COUNSEL TO FL BA W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPOINTMENT MAY BE VACATED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 080990 SCHPRD V
09/06/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 090690 SCHPRD BA
01/23/1991ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLEE SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 101190 SCHPRD BE
02/21/1991FiledBriefing Completed
02/21/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 022291 SCHPRD BE
05/07/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/07/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD