judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY Q. KERNS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0459
Short Caption:ANTHONY Q. KERNS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6525-81Filed Date:04/21/1987

Opening Event Date:04/21/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/05/1988
Argued/Submitted:11/15/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/25/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Q. Kerns N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Roberto Iraola YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KERNS, ANTHONY Q. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 APPEAL FROM ORDER AMENDING NOTE - 01 SENTENCE (FE: MII W/ARMED)
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
04/21/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
06/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/24/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD R
01/19/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED (PER ATTY'S REQUEST NO RTC) PB PANEL SCDATE 072487 SCHPRD RT
02/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 29, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 022888 SCHPRD BA
03/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/5/88 (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 032988 SCHPRD BA
04/05/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 040588 SCHPRD BA
04/05/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 4/5/88- NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 040488 SCHPRD V
05/05/1988FiledBriefing Completed
05/05/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD BE
11/15/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/15/1988SUBMITTED PANELRGMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1989REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV TRIAL COURT JDGMT/ CAUSE RM FOR RESENTENCING AS SET FORTH IN OPINION FILED PANELRGMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 551 A.2d 1336
01/04/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0012
01/25/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD