judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEREL E. PINKNEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0449
Short Caption:GEREL E. PINKNEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7318-86Filed Date:04/15/1987

Opening Event Date:04/15/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGerel E. Pinkney N
Sumner J. Katz NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PINKNEY, GEREL E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 KATZS VACATED 7/6/89.
04/15/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/10/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SUMNER KATZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 061587 SCHPRD R
06/29/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD DSA
07/01/1987ORDER DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062287 SCHPRD DSA
07/14/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT FILED (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD BA
07/28/1987LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE SUP.CT. ORDER AND WHETHER A REMAND IS SOUGHT SL PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987RECEIVED COPY OF LTR FROM APLT ATTY & COPY OF TRIAL CRT ORD W/RESPCT TO REMAND. ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (26 PGS - MITCHELL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 072487 SCHPRD CHECK
10/29/1987ORDER APLT'S BRIEF DUE 40 DAYS AFTER 9/11/86 & 9/18/86 TRANSCRIPTS ARE FILED W/THIS COURT SL PANELPY SCDATE 120287 SCHPRD BA
06/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (18 PGS - BRADLEY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/10/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1988LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT; RESPONSE DUE BY 7/22/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD X
07/06/1989AFFIRMED GRANT MO OF COUNSEL TO W/D; AFFIRM ORDER ON APPEAL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081587 SCHPRD RT
07/06/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
07/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD