judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN D. BALDWIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CO-0971
Short Caption:KEVIN D. BALDWIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:06/23/1986

Opening Event Date:06/23/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/11/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/25/1987
Argued/Submitted:04/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/03/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin D. Baldwin N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David H. Saffern YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BALDWIN, KEVIN D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/25/87 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL NOTE - 02 LODGED BE;GRANT MO OD APLE TO NOTE - 02 SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT TO NOTE - 03 TRANSMIT PETITION MENTIONED IN NOTE - 03 APLE MO AS A SUPP REC;GRANT NOTE - 04 MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL NOTE - 04 REPLY BRF TO 11/30/87;CLK TO NOTE - 05 SCHED FOR CONSIDERATION AS NOTE - 05 SOON AS BIZ OF CRT PERMITS.
06/23/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/26/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SANDRA J. BOEK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/11/1986RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 082286 SCHPRD R
10/22/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 102286 SCHPRD BA
11/04/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS IN RECEIVED RJG PANEL SCDATE 102986 SCHPRD CHECK
12/02/1986RECEIVED APLT'S STATEMENT INFORMING THE COURT OF TRANSCRIPTS RECEIVED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 111486 SCHPRD CHECK
02/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 13TH JB PANEL SCDATE 021187 SCHPRD BA
02/27/1987ORDER GRANTING APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/13/87; NFX DAS PANELPY SCDATE 030487 SCHPRD OPE
03/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 031387 SCHPRD BA
03/20/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/25/1987ORDER GRT MO CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD APLT'S BR; APLE'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 033087 SCHPRD CHECK
04/23/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 26TH MLH PANEL SCDATE 042487 SCHPRD BE EXTDTE 052687
05/22/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 25TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD BE
06/04/1987ORDER GRT MO; APLE'S BR DUE 6/25/87; NFX TTC PANELPY SCDATE 060187 SCHPRD CHECK
06/24/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 27TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 062587 SCHPRD BE
07/23/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 26TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD CHECK
07/24/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 26TH (NO OPPO) (CORRECTED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987ORDER GRANT APLE'S MOS FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLE BR DUE 8/26/87- NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 080487 SCHPRD CHECK
10/21/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME PB PANEL SCDATE 082687 SCHPRD BE
10/21/1987APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD W/ APLT'S PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/12/1987APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 30, 1987 (NO OPPO) (APPELLANT'S) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/25/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD CHECK
11/30/1987APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 113087 SCHPRD RBA
12/07/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(PET. FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122887 SCHPRD SR
04/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/07/1988SUBMITTED PANELFERGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFERGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/03/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1993RECEIVED pro-se notice of intent.