judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERNEST L. TOYE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0301
Short Caption:ERNEST L. TOYE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 85-CF-0108 Consolidated:87-CF-0301
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2259-84Filed Date:03/25/1987

Opening Event Date:03/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/28/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/08/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/20/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantErnest L. Toye N
Richard H. Nakamura YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia L. Petty YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TOYE, ERNEST L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 85-108 NOTE - 01
03/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD H. NAKAMURA, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 040687 SCHPRD CHECK
05/12/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD DSA
05/29/1987ORDER CONSOL 85-108 AND 87-301; CLK OF SUPER CT TO TRANSMIT RECORD IN 87-301 FORTHWITH. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD R
05/29/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD R
11/20/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (317 PGS - TOOBY) PB PANEL SCDATE 103087 SCHPRD RT
10/28/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(50 PGS /BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 070187 SCHPRD RT
10/31/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD BA
01/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/15/89 PANEL SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 2/15/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 012589 SCHPRD OPA
02/15/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-17-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD BE
03/10/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/17/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD OPA
03/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-14-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD BE
03/21/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S THIRD MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD CHECK
04/19/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL BRIEF TO 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD Q
04/19/1989RECEIVED OPA TO APPELLEE'S MXBE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD BE
05/16/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD OPA
06/08/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/08/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLE BRF; CASE TO BE SCHEDULED AS CALENDAR PERMITS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 033189 SCHPRD CHECK
11/20/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/20/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/12/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD