judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALBERT E. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0374
Short Caption:ALBERT E. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 87-CM-0349 Consolidated:87-CF-0374
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4096-80Filed Date:03/30/1987

Opening Event Date:03/30/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/27/1987
Argued/Submitted:07/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/29/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlbert E. Smith N
Matthew C. LeeferYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Silvia L. Roman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, ALBERT E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/27/87 ORD: GRT APLE'S MO NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FILE BRIEF, CLK NOTE - 02 DIRTD TO FILE LODGED BRIEF. FO NOTE - 02 THAT CLK IS DIRTD TO CALENDAR NOTE - 03 THIS CASE FOR CONSID. BEFORE A NOTE - 03 MERITS DIV. AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 04 BUSINESS OF THE COURT PERMITS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 87-349 NOTE - 05
03/30/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 052687 SCHPRD DSA
06/04/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 052987 SCHPRD R
06/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/09/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/25/1987LETTER LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT RE: AFFIDAVIT RECV'D FROM APLT ON 6/5/87. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 12TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 072087 SCHPRD BA
07/23/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD CHECK
08/24/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD BA
09/28/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/28/87 PB PANEL SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD BE
10/29/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD OPA
10/29/1987RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/27/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELPY SCDATE 111087 SCHPRD OPA
05/04/1988ORDER SS, CONS 87-349 & 87-374 & CLK TO SCHED AS SOON AS BIZ OF CRT PERMITS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/06/1988SUBMITTED PANELFEBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/08/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/29/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD