judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WAYNE T. SLEDGE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0310
Short Caption:WAYNE T. SLEDGE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7933-85Filed Date:03/16/1987

Opening Event Date:03/16/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/01/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/07/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWayne T. Sledge N
Reginald G. Addison NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SLEDGE, WAYNE T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: KHAYAN FRUSTER NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 090487 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 02 IN 10 DAYS TO FILE A MO TO NOTE - 03 W/DRAW APPEAL, INCLUDING A NOTE - 03 STATE IN ACCORDANCE WITH NOTE - 04 Johnson v. U.S., 513 A.2d 798 NOTE - 04 (D.C. 1986), OR COUNSEL W/IN NOTE - 05 40 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 122487 ORDER: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 06 IN 10 DAYS TO FILE MO TO DIS- NOTE - 07 MISS, INCLUDING STATE IN ACCOR NOTE - 07 W/JOHNSON V. U.S. 513 A.2d 798 NOTE - 08 OR COUNSEL TO FILE APLT BR BY NOTE - 08 1/20/88. NOTE - 09 1/29/88 ORD: APLT W/I 10 DAYS NOTE - 09 TO FILE MO TO WITHDRAW THE NOTE - 10 APPEAL INCL. A STMT IN ACCORD. NOTE - 10 WITH JOHNSON V. U.S., NOTE - 11 513 A.2D 798 (D.C. 1986). NOTE - 11 NOTE - 12 3/1/88 ORD: COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 12 W/I 10 DAYS SHALL SHOW CAUSE NOTE - 13 WHY HIS APPTMT SHOULD NOT BE NOTE - 13 VACATED AND THIS MTR REFERRED NOTE - 14 TO THE BOARD ON PROFESSIONAL NOTE - 14 RESPONSIBILITY.
03/16/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/01/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 032687 SCHPRD CHECK
04/30/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) REGINALD G. ADDISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD R
06/01/1987FiledRecord Completed
06/01/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT OF THE CASE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 05. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 071387 SCHPRD BA
09/18/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (137 PGS - ALLISON) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO EXT TO OCT 21ST TO FILE MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEAL PURSUANT TO 9/4/87 ORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1987ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS -NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101487 SCHPRD BA
12/21/1987STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 - 08. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 122287 SCHPRD EBP
01/21/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO WITHDRAW HIS APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 9 THRU 11 SL PANELPY SCDATE 012788 SCHPRD OPE
03/01/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12 THRU 14 SL PANELPY SCDATE 020888 SCHPRD MDSA
03/14/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJG PANEL SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD ANSA
03/17/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/17/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D APPEAL & CASE DISMISSED DAS PANELPY SCDATE 031588 SCHPRD Q
03/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
04/07/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD