judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WARREN T. ASKEW V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0893
Short Caption:WARREN T. ASKEW V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead:88-CF-0893Consolidated: 88-CF-1494
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3635-85Filed Date:07/12/1988

Opening Event Date:07/12/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/04/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWarren T. Askew N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ASKEW, WARREN T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DOUGHTY GARDNER NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 12/14/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 02 FOR STAY; COUNSEL FOR APLT TO NOTE - 03 FL STATE IN 30 DAYS AS TO THE NOTE - 03 STATUS OF PENDG TRL PROCEEDING NOTE - 04 1/30/89 ORD: GRANT MO TO CONS NOTE - 04 88-893 & 88-1494; COUNSEL FOR NOTE - 05 APLT TO FL STATE IN 60 DAYS NOTE - 05 ADVISING CRT OF STATUS OF NOTE - 06 COSGROVE V. THORNBURGH PENDG NOTE - 06 IN US DISTRICT CRT. NOTE - 07 CON 88-1494 NOTE - 07
07/12/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/02/1988ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 081288 SCHPRD DSA
10/04/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/04/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 091288 SCHPRD R
10/27/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY UNTIL TRIAL COURT HAS RULED ON PENDING MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 & 03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD N
01/12/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO DECEMBER 14TH ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS JB PANEL SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD STATE
01/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 88-1494 (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD Q
04/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT & CASE DIS- MISSED AS MOOT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 041289 SCHPRD ANSA
05/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
06/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD