judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES L. GRAHAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0838
Short Caption:JAMES L. GRAHAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12011-87Filed Date:06/24/1988

Opening Event Date:06/24/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/07/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/23/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/13/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames L. Graham N
Betty M. Ballester YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Leslie A. Blackmon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRAHAM, JAMES L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 072889 ORD: CRT-APTED COUNSEL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE NOTE - 02 APLT BRF OR SHOW CAUSE WHY NOTE - 02 APPTMENT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED NOTE - 03 & NAME STRICKEN FROM CJA NOTE - 03 APPOINTMENTS.
06/24/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/19/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BETTY M. HUNTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD DSA
09/02/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD (RTC) PANEL SCDATE 082388 SCHPRD R
09/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(44 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
11/07/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/07/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2( 73 PGS/ BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 103088 SCHPRD RT
12/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-27-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
12/30/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/27/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD CHECK
01/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 28TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD BA
02/14/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 2/28/89 - NO FUTHER EXT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 020989 SCHPRD CHECK
03/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-28-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD BA
07/28/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 ACG PANELRO SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD CHECK
08/07/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/10/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD BE
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/10/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091289 SCHPRD OPA
10/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-17-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD BE
10/19/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/23/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD OPA
03/13/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/13/1990SUBMITTED RJG PANELROTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELROTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD