judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRIAN PANNELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0781
Short Caption:BRIAN PANNELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13055-87Filed Date:06/14/1988

Opening Event Date:06/14/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/19/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/29/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBrian Pannell N
Terrence M. O'Connor YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PANNELL, BRIAN UNITED STATES
06/14/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/06/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) TERRENCE M. O'CONNOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS GT PB PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD DSA
07/21/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 081588 SCHPRD R
08/11/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL FORTY (40) DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS RECIEVED GT (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(132 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 100188 SCHPRD RT
10/19/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(8 PGS/HUNT) AD PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD RT
11/30/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL FORTY (40) DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT HAVE BEEN RECEIVED GT PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD BA
12/12/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (33 PGS RT - TANNER) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 1/23/89. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD M
01/23/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 5 DAYS AFTER RECEIPT OF ALL TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (4 PGS RT - TANNER) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(4 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT THAT APLT BR IS DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD M
03/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6(46 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 030589 SCHPRD RT
04/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 5, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 040589 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/5/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD OPA
05/04/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-1-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 050589 SCHPRD BE
06/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-29-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/29/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061389 SCHPRD OPA
06/29/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/29/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 062989 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD