judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABDUL RAHMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1465
Short Caption:ABDUL RAHMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F20616-77Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/31/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAbdul Rahman N
Barbara L. Smith NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RAHMAN, ABDUL AKA CLYDE YOUNG UNITED STATES
12/21/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/16/1990$50.00 DOCKETING FEE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1990ORDER APLT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DSA AND DR W/IN 10 DAYS OR CASE MAY BE DISMISSED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD DSA
05/09/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/09/1990ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY W/RULES OF COURT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/31/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD