judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELVIN J. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0760
Short Caption:MELVIN J. TAYLOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3748-83Filed Date:06/26/1987

Opening Event Date:06/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/21/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/31/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/11/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/04/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMelvin J. Taylor N
Lawrence M. Baskir YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kevin A. Forder YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TAYLOR, MELVIN J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: MICHAEL TAYLOR NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/04/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BASKIRL FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FORDERK FOR - APPELLEE
06/26/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/08/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LAWRENCE M. BASKIR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1987FiledRecord Completed
08/21/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (23 PGS. - HART) PM PANEL SCDATE 082587 SCHPRD R
08/24/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCTIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD BA
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (113 PGS RT-HUNT) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/14/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXTENT THAT APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092887 SCHPRD OPE
04/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (53 PGS - IRVING) JB PANEL SCDATE 021988 SCHPRD RT
05/26/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 31ST JB PB PANEL SCDATE 060188 SCHPRD BA
06/30/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 063088 SCHPRD BA
07/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/6/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 080488 SCHPRD BE
09/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 6, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BE
09/22/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 10/6/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD V
10/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 25TH JB PB PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD BE
10/25/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/31/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1989LETTER GRANTING APLT'S REQ FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 4/11/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD OPE
04/11/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/11/1989ARGUED PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGSTRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -ST CITE 565 A.2d 992
11/13/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - ST PAGE # - 2806
12/04/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD