judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN R. HAWKINS, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0688
Short Caption:JOHN R. HAWKINS, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3280-85Filed Date:06/10/1987

Opening Event Date:06/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/14/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn R. Hawkins, Jr.N
Anita Isicson NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAWKINS JR., JOHN R. UNITED STATES
06/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/30/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
07/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1987RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) PM PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD R
09/08/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 SHELTON- 24 PGS TB PANEL SCDATE 091887 SCHPRD RT
09/10/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED TB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPTS ARE FILED MLH PANEL SCDATE 102187 SCHPRD BA
11/18/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 110287 SCHPRD OPE
01/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GREG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (6 PGS TR - MILLER) GREG PANEL SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD RT
03/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 030788 SCHPRD BA
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (9 PGS - TOOBY) JB PANEL SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD RT
06/21/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (13 PGS - GLEASON) GT PANEL SCDATE 041588 SCHPRD RT
07/13/1988RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER DATED 7/12/88 FROM CRT REPORTER SANBORN TO APPELLANT'S ATTORNEY MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988FiledRecord Completed
09/14/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(35 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD RT
10/24/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD BA
11/18/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/18/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELRO SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD N
11/18/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD