judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN E. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1139
Short Caption:JOHN E. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12838-86Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:10/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/21/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Anita Isicson NN
AppellantJohn E. Joseph N
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joyce J. Bang YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOSEPH, JOHN E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 2/6/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF ANITA ISICSON & APPT CALVIN NOTE - 02 STEINMETZ FOR APLT; NEWLY APPT NOTE - 03 COUNSEL TO ADVISE CRT IN 20 NOTE - 03 DAYS WHETHER HE INTENDS TO FL NOTE - 04 SUPP BRF ON BEHALF OF APLT; NOTE - 04 FLNG OF APLE'S BRF HELD IN NOTE - 05 ABEY PENDG INDICATION OF NOTE - 05 COUNSEL FOR APLT WHETHER A NOTE - 06 SUPP BRF WILL BE FILED. NOTE - 06
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/10/18 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - STEINMETZC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BANGJ FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 ISICSONA VACATED 2/6/89.
09/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANITA ISICSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD DSA
12/05/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 101888 SCHPRD R
12/19/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(51 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 16TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 011689 SCHPRD BA
01/24/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF ANITA ISICSON AND TO SUB- STITUTE CALVIN STEINMETZ AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/16/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 011889 SCHPRD X
02/01/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD BA
02/06/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-06. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD GG
02/14/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: FILING OF A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD ANSA
02/24/1989ORDER BRF OF APLE SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD V
02/28/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE STIPULATING THAT RT & 23-110 MO BE MADE PART OF THE RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 25, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD BE
04/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (581 PGS.--RHOADES; 177 PGS --CALHOUN & 71 PGS. -- IRVING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/24/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD BE
04/21/1989ORDER DENY MO TO SUP REC AS MOOT; GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 4/25/89. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 032189 SCHPRD M
05/08/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/24/89; NFX DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 042589 SCHPRD BE
05/24/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BE
10/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/18/1989ARGUED PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 597 A.2d 14
09/13/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2600
09/26/1991PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1991ORDER THAT APLE W/I 20 DAYS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH REH EN BANC (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1991APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REHEARING OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REHEARING EN BANC AJ PANEL SCDATE 111391 SCHPRD ANSE
11/15/1991ORDER GRT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL OPPO & OPPO TO PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC DUE ON 11/27/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 112591 SCHPRD OPA
11/27/1991APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MRRB PMB PANEL SCDATE 112791 SCHPRD OPE
01/15/1992APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CALVIN STEINMETZ, ESQ. (PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/21/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1992NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI