judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BROWN, MARVIN UNITED STATES

Case Information: 86-CM-1276
Short Caption:BROWN, MARVIN UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7548-86Filed Date:09/04/1986

Opening Event Date:09/04/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/16/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/30/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin Brown N
John C. Krollman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Leslie A. Blackmon YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, MARVIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/06/21 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KROLLMANJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BLACKMONL FOR - APPELLEE
09/04/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/31/1986APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/03/1986RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 110586 SCHPRD R
02/07/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL W/IN 20 DAYS TO FILE STMT RE RT (NAME OF RPTR, DATE ORD, EST DATE) FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE RJG PANEL SCDATE 022889 SCHPRD STATE
03/01/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S ANSWER TO COURT ORDER DATED 2/7/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO FILE STATE; FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD M
04/07/1989STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO 2/7/89 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/26/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(88 PGS/MOLLICHELLI) AD PANEL SCDATE 102289 SCHPRD RT
09/22/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFERRED TO BPR. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD BA
10/04/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 22ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO SEPTEMBER 22ND COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-25-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/31/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO FL ANS TO 9/22 ORDER; GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF 40 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 102689 SCHPRD M
12/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 121089 SCHPRD BA
01/08/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BA TO AND INCLUDING 1/19/90. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR APTMT TO BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 020990 SCHPRD BA
03/16/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD BE
06/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/21/1990ARGUED PANELFESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1991REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV ORDER ON APPEAL/ CAUSE RM w/INSTRUCTIONS AS SET FORTH IN OPINION PANELFESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE 590 A.2d 1008
05/08/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 1241 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - GA PAGE # - 0000
05/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD